skip to content

Zaki, Anne Marie

CPSO#: 90831

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9127 W. Thunderbird Rd Suite 104
Peoria AZ  85381
United States
Phone: (623) 972-2158

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:10 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011 Active
             Dr. Anne Marie Zaki may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology, only.