skip to content

Zakaria, Joseph Daniel

CPSO#: 88378

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 945-8623
Fax: (519) 945-5708 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Zakaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zakaria ( CPSO# 88378 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 945-8623

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH DANIEL ZAKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010