Zaidi, Syed Ali Imran (CPSO#: 100333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
611 HOLLY AVENUE
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905) 878-1562
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNIT 102-103,9715 JAMES POTTER ROAD
Brampton ON  L6X 3B9
Canada
Phone: 9054575800
Fax: 9054575080
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Ali Imran Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zaidi ( CPSO# 100333)

Business Address:
103 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0086

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED ALI IMRAN ZAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015