skip to content

Zaidi, Mukarram Ali

CPSO#: 90273

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 22 Jan 2013
EXPIRY DATE
22 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mukarram Ali Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2013