skip to content

Zahanova, Stacy

CPSO#: 97823

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: 905 235 7320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
1600 Steeles Ave. West
Unit 5
Vaughan ON  L4K 4M2
Canada
Phone: 905-763-8660
Fax: 905-763-0708
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zahanova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zahanova ( CPSO# 97823 )

Business Address:
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 253-7284

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Business Address:
5 - 1600 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 763-8660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STACY ZAHANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHANOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018