skip to content

Zafar, Rubeena

CPSO#: 93392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: 905-535-7800 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chartwell Barton Retirement Residen
17290 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E1
Canada
Phone: 905 967 1331
Fax: 905 853 7406
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

32 Mill Street
Chartwell Aurora Long Term Care Res
Aurora ON  L4G 2R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 727-1939
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

160 High Street West
River Glen Haven Nursing Home
Sutton West ON  L0E 1R0
Canada
Phone: (905) 722-8148
Fax: (905) 722-7992
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2656 Line 6
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A1
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rubeena Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zafar ( CPSO# 93392 )

Business Address:
160 High Street
Sutton ON  L0E 1R0
Phone Number: (905) 722-8148

Business Address:
Georgina Family Medical Centre
201 - 417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone Number: (905) 989-7800

Business Address:
17290 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L1R 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 967-1331

Business Address:
24 Orchard Heights Boulevard
Aurora ON  L4G 6T5
Phone Number: (905) 751-0916

Business Address:
32 Mill Street
Aurora ON  L4G 2R9
Phone Number: (905) 727-1939

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUBEENA ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 31 May 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 28 Aug 2011 to 30 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 31 May 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013