skip to content

Zaazou, Mostafa Abdel Fattah Taha Ismail

CPSO#: 87357

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone: (905) 275-4400
Fax: (905) 275-4403 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zaazou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaazou ( CPSO# 87357 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 275-4400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOSTAFA ABDEL FATTAH TAHA ISMAIL ZAAZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAAZOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 03 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009