skip to content

Yung, Christoph Ying-Wai

CPSO#: 24309

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006