skip to content

Yule, Joanna Elizabeth

CPSO#: 93215

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Home St
Brockville ON  K6V0A5
Phone: 6134233333 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

110-100 Strowger Blvd
Upper Canada Family Heatlh Team
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Canada
Phone: 6134233333
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fuoco Yule Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fuoco ( CPSO# 92964 )
Dr. J. Yule ( CPSO# 93215 )

Business Address:
38 Water Street East
Brockville ON  K6V 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 342-5668

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6B 1T6
Phone Number: (613) 342-8176

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOANNA ELIZABETH YULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YULE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013