skip to content

Yuen, Sheila Sze Yung

CPSO#: 84760

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pro Health Medical Clinic
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 403
North York ON  M2K2W1
Phone: (416)222-0660
Fax: (416)222-9238 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Yang & Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yang ( CPSO# 84729 )
Dr. S. Yuen ( CPSO# 84760 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Business Address:
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEILA SZE YUNG YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008