skip to content

Yuen, Andrew Wilfred

CPSO#: 101216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East Health Network
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILFRED YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018