skip to content

Yuan, George

CPSO#: 92166

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110-920 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone: 613-547-9172
Fax: 613-547-9910 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

7-55 Frid St
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Canada
Phone: 905-529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

204-6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: 888-905-6992
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: George Yuan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yuan ( CPSO# 92166 )

Business Address:
110-920 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 547-9172

Business Address:
7-55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
204-6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 374-6453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEORGE YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
EL - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012