skip to content

Yu, Tak Chi Michael

CPSO#: 31623

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For patients seen before January 30, 2019 at the Bayridge After Hours Clinic, please send an e-mail to: [email protected] For patients being seen between February 1, 2019 to March 15, 2020, please contact CDK Family clinic,105 Sutherland Drive, Kingston, ON K7K 5V6.
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020