skip to content

Yu, Ryan Shange

CPSO#: 95223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yu ( CPSO# 95223 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:25 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN SHANGE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018