skip to content

Yu, Huan

CPSO#: 98296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
370 Bayview Dr
Suite 110
Barrie, ON
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 737-0830
Fax: 705-737-0679 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUAN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2016 to 14 Dec 2016
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016