skip to content

Yu, Andrea Carmen

CPSO#: 98372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 6137377600 Ext. 2821 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA CARMEN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017