skip to content

Youssef, Tarek

CPSO#: 89744

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Youssef, Tarek Ahmed Abdul-Salam (used until: 10 Sep 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
127 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3H1
Phone: (613) 933-9100
Fax: 613-902-3178 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Youssef ( CPSO# 89744 )

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
127 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3H1
Phone Number: (613) 933-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:24 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active
             Dr.  Tarek  Ahmed  Abdul-Salam  Youssef  may practise medicine independently in
            Ophthalmology, only.