skip to content

Youssef, Mariam Fayek Gobrial

CPSO#: 90519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 8452571 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mariam Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Youssef ( CPSO# 90519 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIAM FAYEK GOBRIAL YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)