skip to content

Youssef, Hany Awny Ayad

CPSO#: 94510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
13025 Yonge Street
PO Box 2639
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 1A6
Phone: (905) 773-3342
Fax: (905) 773-9669 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 94510 )

Business Address:
Unit 101
13025 Yonge Street
PO Box 2639
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 770-9057

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
PO Box 5003
Uxbridge ON  L9S 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANY AWNY AYAD YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2020