skip to content

Youssef, George Youssef Ibrahim

CPSO#: 91607

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019