skip to content

Yousif, Mazin Ablahad

CPSO#: 92019

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Davis Centre
C2b
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone: (905) 898-3700 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mazin Yousif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yousif ( CPSO# 92019 )

Business Address:
Yonge Davis Centre
C2B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone Number: (905) 898-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAZIN ABLAHAD YOUSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSIF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011