skip to content

Yousef, Jakline Maher Yacoub

CPSO#: 87935

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
M3M0B2
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z4
Phone: (416) 2421000 Ext. 43099 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAKLINE MAHER YACOUB YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009