skip to content

Younger-Lewis, Catherine Joan

CPSO#: 30118

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Services Carleton U 2600-1125 University Drive Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019