skip to content

Young, Kevin James

CPSO#: 86807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: 705-549-3181
Fax: 705-549-3446 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 175
25 Museum Drive
Orillia ON  L3V 7T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 329-3649 Ext. 228
Fax: (705) 325-8148
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kevin Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Young ( CPSO# 86807 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Business Address:
175 - 25 Museum Drive
Orillia ON  L3V 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 242-0442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN JAMES YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011