skip to content

Young, Kelvin

CPSO#: 100310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELVIN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018