skip to content

Young, Hibbert Thomas

CPSO#: 86005

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Mar 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Manitouwadge Medical Clinic 1 Clinic Rd. Manitouwadge, ON P0T 2C0
Date Received: 03 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:29 May 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017