Young, Christine (CPSO#: 100572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-3292 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: 416-445-4067
Fax: 416-445-0206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Young Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Young ( CPSO# 100572)

Business Address:
105 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 445-4067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Apr 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2016