skip to content

You, Yue

CPSO#: 86736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Mandarin

Education:Free University of Berlin, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 360
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 905-582-8789
Fax: 905-582-5005 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Y. You Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. You ( CPSO# 86736 )

Business Address:
360 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-8789

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YUE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2008 to 30 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 31 Jan 2009 to 30 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 31 Jan 2010 to 30 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 31 Jan 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013