skip to content

Yoshy, Catherine Susan

CPSO#: 31078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
P O Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52342 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Yoshy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yoshy ( CPSO# 31078 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C2-342
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE SUSAN YOSHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1985