skip to content

Yoshioka, John Michio

CPSO#: 12883

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Nov 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 1986