skip to content

Yong-Set, Wrenrick Egerton

CPSO#: 26871

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1974
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1998
Summary:

In July 1998, Dr. Yong-Set pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he has 
committed sexual impropriety with a patient.   The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. 
Yong-Set s guilty plea, and found him guilty of professional misconduct. 
 
The Discipline Committee accepted the joint submissions of counsel with respect to penalty and 
ordered the following penalty: 
 
      (1)   Dr. Yong-Set shall be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 
            Register; 
      (2)   Dr. Yong-Set s certificate of registration to practice medicine in the Province of 
            Ontario shall be suspended for a period of 12 months, with the period of suspension to 
            commence on September 1, 1998; 
      (3)   all but 6 months of the said suspension of Dr. Yong-Set s certificate of registration 
            shall itself be suspended, provided that Dr. Yong-Set abides by the following terms 
            and conditions: 
 
            (a)   Dr. Yong-Set shall practice medicine only in a group practice with other 
                  physicians, and those physicians shall be given notice of the decision of the 
                  Discipline Committee in this matter and the penalty imposed by the Discipline 
                  Committee; 
            (b)   Dr. Yong-Set shall not see any patients unless another physician or staff 
                  member is present in the facility where the examination is being conducted 
                  (although not necessarily in the room where the examination is being 
                  conducted); 
            (c)   Dr. Yong-Set shall have a notice posted in his office, and in any examining 
                  room where he sees patients, advising patients of their right to have a third 
                  party present during any examination or treatment; 
            (d)   Dr. Yong-Set shall comply with any request by a patient to have a third party 
                  present during any examination or treatment; 
            (e)   Dr. Yong-Set shall participate in a programme of maintenance therapy and 
                  relapse prevention with Dr. Graham Glancy, or such other psychiatrist or 
                  mental health professional as may be acceptable to the Registrar and Dr. 
                  Yong-Set, with any costs of the programme not covered by the Ontario Health 
                  Insurance Plan being borne by Dr. Yong-Set, and which shall include at least 
                  the following elements: 
 
                  (1)   that Dr. Yong-Set attend for a one day program with Dr. Glancy 
                        prior to re-commencing the practice of medicine following the 
                        expiry of the unsuspended portion of the suspension of his 
                        Certificate of Registration; 
                  (2)   that Dr. Yong-Set attend for ongoing maintenance therapy and 
                        relapse prevention sessions for a period of three years, with the 
                  frequency of such sessions being not less than twice per month in 
                  the first year, and not less than once per month in the following 
                  two years, except at such times as when Dr. Yong-Set may be on 
                  vacation or otherwise not actively engaged in the day to day 
                  practice of medicine and, in the event that Dr. Glancy is on 
                  vacation or otherwise unavailable for a period up to one month, Dr. 
                  Yong-Set shall attend as required above on a mental health 
                  professional designated by and reporting to Dr. Glancy; 
            (3)   that Dr. Yong-Set shall direct Dr. Glancy to report in writing to the 
                  Registrar confirming that Dr. Yong-Set has attended at the said 
                  maintenance therapy and relapse prevention sessions, and that Dr. 
                  Yong-Set shall provide Dr. Glancy with any consent 
            (4)    requested by Dr. Glancy to file such a report; 
 
(4)   On or before the expiry of the unsuspended portion of the suspension of Dr. 
                                                Yong-Set s Certificate of 
                                                Registration, Dr. Yong-Set 
                                                shall provide the College of 
                                                Physicians and Surgeons of 
                                                Ontario with an irrevocable 
                                                letter of credit in the amount 
                                                of $10,000.00 for the purpose 
                                                of reimbursing the College 
                                                for any funding provided to 
                                                the complainant for therapy 
                                                or counselling pursuant to s. 
                                                85.7 of the Health 
                                                Professions Procedural 
                                                Code.  
              
(5)   In the event that Dr. Yong-Set fails to comply with any of the terms and 
      conditions as set out in paragraph 3 of this order, the balance of his suspension 
      shall commence immediately. 
              


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 1998


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 1988
Summary:

 In June 1988, Dr. Yong-Set pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as set out in the 
 Notice of Hearing.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Yong-Set guilty of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that 
 he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Yong-Set be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that 
 his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jun 1988