Yokogawa, Tomonori Alexander (CPSO#: 99678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 726-0173
Fax: (705) 725-1601
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1813 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-9038
Fax: (705) 222-9041
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1122 Lasalle Blvd.
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 705-566-6917
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMONORI ALEXANDER YOKOGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOKOGAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015