skip to content

Yohanna, Seychelle

CPSO#: 93107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yohanna and Koelink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Koelink ( CPSO# 89024 )
Dr. S. Yohanna ( CPSO# 93107 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEYCHELLE YOHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014