skip to content

Yoganathan, Pradeepa

CPSO#: 87399

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Laser Eye Institute
Suite 198
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W3P6
Phone: 5192521953
Fax: 5192527223 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yoganathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yoganathan ( CPSO# 87399 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
2056 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 208
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Business Address:
198 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 252-1953


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

USA - New York

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRADEEPA YOGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010