skip to content

Yip, Gina Tak Chee

CPSO#: 90918

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: (905) 472-5662 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gina Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yip ( CPSO# 90918 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GINA TAK CHEE YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011