skip to content

Yip, Amelia Ming Ching

CPSO#: 90717

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 - 430 Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 416
Fax: (519) 741-5772 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amelia Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yip ( CPSO# 90717 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMELIA MING CHING YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
EL - Cardiology

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2015 to 21 Aug 2015
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Aug 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016