skip to content

Ying, Ivan Shouchen

CPSO#: 90917

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ying and Loh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying ( CPSO# 90917 )
Dr. M. Loh ( CPSO# 95646 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2064

Business Address:
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 481-1173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IVAN SHOUCHEN YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013