skip to content

Ying, Irene

CPSO#: 88879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
room H336
2075 Bayview Ave
Palliative Care Consult Team
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Ying Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying ( CPSO# 88879 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Palliative Care Consultation Team
Suite H336
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRENE YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010