skip to content

Yeung, Yan

CPSO#: 100644

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo Rheumatology
430 The Boardwalk, Suite 208
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-584-2993
Fax: 519-742-4657 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yan Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yeung ( CPSO# 100644)

Business Address:
Waterloo Rheumatology
Suite 208
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 742-0107

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YAN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2018