skip to content

Yeung, Jacky Yat-Tung

CPSO#: 84847

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6837
Fax: (705) 740-6811 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3388
Fax: (613) 544-3041
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jacky Y.T. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yeung ( CPSO# 84847 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
201 - 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6837

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACKY YAT-TUNG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011