skip to content

Yeung, Grace Wing-Yan

CPSO#: 93136

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1275 Finch Ave West
Suite 107
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 0L5
Toronto ON  M3J 0L5
Phone: 647-341-0281
Fax: 647-361-0451 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Grace Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yeung ( CPSO# 93136 )

Business Address:
401 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 341-0281

Business Address:
107-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 0L5
Phone Number: 6473410281

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE WING-YAN YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015