skip to content

Yeung, Clement Ka-Chun

CPSO#: 32020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jan 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4261 Highway 7 East
Unit B2
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Phone: (905) 470-7373
Fax: (905) 470-7374 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.K. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yeung ( CPSO# 32020 )

Business Address:
Unit B2
4261 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 9W6

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Feb 2019 Active
             (Matter 1 of 3)

            As from February 15, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun
            Yeung, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Yeung to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                    
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR.  CLEMENT KA-CHUN YEUNG
                  
                                          ("Dr. Yeung")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                  
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Yeung, certificate of registration number 32020, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my prescribing practice and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation, bearing File Number 1104719, into the information.

            (4)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from 
                  making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of
                  the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.  

            (8)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter
                        to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                        substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to immediately refer all patients to whom I
                        am prescribing any of the substances described in section 8(c),
                        above, to other physicians for assessment and care.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to
                        other physicians pursuant to section (8)(d), above (the "Log"). I,
                        Dr. Yeung, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient
                        referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of
                        referral. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances
                  referred to in section (8)(c) above that are presently in my possession,
                  in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in
                  the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (10)  I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any
                  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with
                  which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                  Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of the date of
                  this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (11)  Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE

                              Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following: 
                  
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of the date of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that if I elect, after the date of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (11)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (11)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (14)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (18)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 


            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung's
                              prescribing practice and is conducting an investigation into
                              the information. During the investigation and in the event of
                              a referral to the Discipline Committee:
                  
                              Dr. Yeung shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                              prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22);   

                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all
                              Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the
                                    following: 
                  
                                    -     Narcotic Drugs
                                    -     Narcotic Preparations
                                    -     Controlled Drugs
                                    -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (23)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.


            (Matter 2 of 3)

            As from January 9, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun
            Yeung, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Yeung to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CLEMENT KA-CHUN YEUNG
                                          ("Dr. Yeung")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Yeung, certificate of registration number 32020, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that my practice was the subject of an
                  assessment by the College.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) appointed by the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts once every
                              month for a period of at least three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month for a period of at least three
                              (3) months
                  
                        (iv)  Directly observe my practice for a minimum of one half day
                              every month, including observing at minimum 6-10 patient
                              encounters for a period of at least three (3) months;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and the
                              direct observation of patient encounters;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) If after three (3) months, the Clinical Supervisor is of the
                              opinion that I have made sufficient improvement in my medical
                              record-keeping and my care to practice under a lower level
                              supervision, and subject to approval from the College, for
                              the remaining nine (9) months of the supervision, the
                              Clinical Supervisor may: 
                  
                              i.    Review at least fifteen (15) of my charts once every
                                    quarter; and 
                              ii.   Meet with me at least once every quarter;
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College following every
                              meeting, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the assessor dated September 14, 2016, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that the College will appoint a
                        Clinical Supervisor who has executed the undertaking at Appendix
                        "A" within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and agree that if a person who has given
                        an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, the College will,
                        within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                        executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified
                        person who is appointed by the College. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Yeung, agree that if, at any time, I terminate my
                        relationship with the Clinical Supervisor or refuse to practice
                        under the terms of Clinical Supervision as set out in section (5)
                        of this Undertaking, I will cease practising medicine until the
                        terms of the Clinical Supervision are varied and/or approved by the
                        College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Yeung, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Yeung, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Yeung, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Yeung, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Yeung was the subject of an assessment by the College. As
                              a result of the assessment:
                  
                              *     Dr. Yeung will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor for twelve (12) months; and
                  
                              *     Dr. Yeung's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    within three (3) months of the end of the period of
                                    Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Yeung, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
            (Matter 3 of 3)

            As from 11:59 p.m., January 23, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung:

                  (i)   that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's
                        Physician's Prescribing Skills course and shall successfully
                        complete an educational program in Ethics, both no later than one
                        (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic
                        Preparations prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics
                        Log") from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for a period of one (1) year from the
                        date he commences practice in Ontario; such supervision shall take
                        place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and shall
                        consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of
                        the Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter,
                        at the discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews
                        with quarterly reporting to the College throughout the supervision
                        period; and
                  
                  (iv)  that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice,
                        including his narcotics prescribing, approximately one (1) year
                        after the completion of the term of clinical supervision set out in
                        paragraph 3(iii).

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jan 2012
Summary:

On January 23, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that 
is relevant to his suitability to practice, and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
In 2007, Dr. Yeung disclosed to the College that he had been convicted in the State of Hawaii of 
charges relating to the dispensing of controlled substances to an undercover agent posing as a 
patient.  
 
On August 30, 2007, Dr. Yeung plead guilty to knowingly and intentionally distributing and 
dispensing outside the course of professional medical practice and not for a legitimate medical 
purpose approximately 1,400 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 14, 2002 and 800 milligrams of 
Oxycodone on June 21, 2002, in the District of Hawaii.  
 
On both occasions, Dr. Yeung met with an undercover DEA agent, who was known to Dr. Yeung 
as his patient, Mr. X. Based on his assessment over the course of 20 medical visits over a 
ten-month period, Dr. Yeung treated Mr. X for chronic back pain with prescription narcotic 
medication. During the course of treatment, Dr. Yeung took steps to decrease the risks associated 
with prescribing narcotic medication. On the two occasions in June 2002, Dr. Yeung met Mr. X 
in a parking lot and prescribed Oxycodone. Mr. X paid Dr. Yeung in cash, since he did not have 
Health Insurance. Dr. Yeung did not profit beyond receiving money for medical services 
rendered to Mr. X. 
 
Dr. Yeung provided written prescriptions to Mr. X for dosages and quantities that are within a 
reasonable range for a patient suffering with chronic back pain.  
 
Dr. Yeung was found guilty of the two counts noted above, and the sentence imposed by the 
court in Hawaii included that Dr. Yeung: be imprisoned for one year and one day; pay a 
$10,000.00 fine within 14 days; pay a $200.00 assessment fee; submit to removal proceedings, 
including deportation or exclusion, as required by the Department of Homeland Security; and 
surrender his Drug Enforcement Administration controlled substance registration. 
 
Dr. Yeung was incarcerated in Hawaii from January 11, 2008 to November 24, 2008 and was 
immediately deported from the United States at the conclusion of his incarceration. Dr. Yeung 
returned to Ontario in December 2008 where he resided until April 2009, at which time he 
moved to Hong Kong. Dr. Yeung held an unrestricted certificate of registration in Ontario during 
that period, but elected not to practice medicine in Ontario until the issues surrounding his 
criminal conviction in Hawaii could be addressed by the College.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Yeung appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, 
      to commence January 23, 2012.  
 
3.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yeung's 
      certificate of registration: 
      (i)   that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's Physician's Prescribing 
            Skills course and shall successfully complete an educational program in Ethics, 
            both no later than one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; 
      (ii)  that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic Preparations 
            prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics Log") from the date he 
            commences practice in Ontario;   
      (iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College 
            for a period of one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; such 
            supervision shall take place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and 
            shall consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of the 
            Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter, at the discretion of the 
            Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews with quarterly reporting to the College 
            throughout the supervision period; and 
      (iv)  that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice, including his narcotics 
            prescribing, approximately one (1) year after the completion of the term of clinical 
            supervision set out in paragraph 3(iii). 
 
4.    Dr. Yeung pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 23, 2012

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 15, 2019:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung's prescribing practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Yeung shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca


Source: Member
Active Date: January 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective January 9, 2017:

Dr. Yeung was the subject of an assessment by the College. As a result of the assessment:

• Dr. Yeung will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor for twelve (12) months; and
• Dr. Yeung’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.