skip to content

Yeung, Ching

CPSO#: 93364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Yeung, Isis Ching (used until: 10 Nov 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 458-4520
Fax: (905) 458-4080 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:08 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHING YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019