Yeung, Alison Rebecca (CPSO#: 97888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
493 Lancaster St. W.
Suite 101
Kitchener, ON
N2K 1L8
Kitchener ON  N2K 1L8
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yeung ( CPSO# 97888 )

Business Address:
101 - 493 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1L8
Phone Number: (519) 747-2172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON REBECCA YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014