skip to content

Yermus, Ryan David

CPSO#: 86282

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
1253 King St. E.
Kitchener ON  N2G 2N5
Phone: (519) 279-6078
Fax: (519) 745-3759 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

509 Park St.
Kitchener ON  N2G1N9
Canada
Phone: 5197461919
Fax: 5197461563
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

1050 2nd Avenue E
Unit 2-3
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2H7
Canada
Phone: (519) 371-0007
Fax: (519) 371-6497
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan Yermus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yermus ( CPSO# 86282 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
175 Commerce Valley West
Markham ON  L3T 7P6

Business Address:
1253 King Street East
Suite 4
Kitchener ON  N2G 2N5

Business Address:
509 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N9

Business Address:
1161 2nd Avenue East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2J1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN DAVID YERMUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YERMUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)