skip to content

Yen, Ziny Chi

CPSO#: 91179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone: (613) 766-0318
Fax: (613) 766-0339 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

CDK Family Medicine
105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston ON  K7K 5V6
Canada
Phone: (613) 767-6167
Fax: (613) 766-0339
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ziny Yen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Yen ( CPSO# 91179 )

Business Address:
CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZINY CHI YEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011