skip to content

Yeh, Shang-Yee Sandy

CPSO#: 100188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 265-8502 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 265-8502
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shang-Yee Yeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yeh ( CPSO# 100188)

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANG-YEE SANDY YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018