skip to content

Yeboah, Ophelia

CPSO#: 86698

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 905-597-7079
Fax: 905-597-7197 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 4401
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2065 Finch Ave W, Suite 212
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Yeboah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Yeboah ( CPSO# 86698 )

Business Address:
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (905) 597-7079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OPHELIA YEBOAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEBOAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012