skip to content

Yeboah, Elizabeth

CPSO#: 95627

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Units 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: (905) 497-7707 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M4J5
Canada
Phone: 416-733-7772
Fax: 416-224-9880
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

103E- 4581 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Canada
Phone: 905-479-9693
Fax: 905-415-1371
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Yeboah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Yeboah ( CPSO# 95627 )

Business Address:
301 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 733-7772

Business Address:
103E - 4581 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Phone Number: (905) 479-9693

Business Address:
Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Units 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YEBOAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEBOAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016