skip to content

Yazdanian, Shirin Olga

CPSO#: 84759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8-50 Dundurn St S
Dundurn Medical Centre Inc.
Unit B8
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone: 905-529-4040
Fax: 905-529-4494 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1150 Franklin Blvd
Ontario Virtual Clinic
Unit 103
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Canada
Phone: 5196214545
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robin Bruen & Shirin Yazdanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yazdanian ( CPSO# 84759 )
Dr. R. Bruen ( CPSO# 102010)

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5858

Business Address:
Unit C
274 Lynden Road
Brantford ON  N3T 5L8
Phone Number: (519) 752-1133

Business Address:
Delhi Family Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Business Address:
103-1150 Franklin Blvd
Ontario Virtual Clinic
Unit 103
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: 5196214545

Business Address:
50 Dundurn St S
Dundurn Medical Centre Inc.
Unit 8
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone Number: 905-529-4040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRIN OLGA YAZDANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008